WI SJR70 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing Black History Month.
Title
Recognizing Black History Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Representatives Mason and Wright added as cosponsors |
2014-02-18 | House | Concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2014-02-18 | House | Read |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | C. Larson, Carpenter, Cowles, Darling, Ellis, Erpenbach, Farrow, Grothman, Gudex, Hansen, Harsdorf, Jauch, Kedzie, Lasee, Lassa, Lazich, Lehman, Leibham, Miller, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, Risser, S. Fitzgerald, Schultz, Shilling, T. Cullen, Tiffany, Vinehout, Vukmir and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |