WI SJR7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and service of Annette Polly Williams.
Title
The life and service of Annette Polly Williams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-26-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Allen, August, Bernier, Billings, Born, Bowen, Brandtjen, Brostoff, C. Taylor, Considine, Craig, Czaja, Doyle, Duchow, E. Brooks, Edming, Gannon, Genrich, Heaton, Hesselbein, Horlacher, J. Ott, Jacque, Jagler, Jarchow, Jorgensen, Katsma, Kerkman, Kitchens, Kleefisch, Knodl, Knudson, Kolste, Kooyenga, Kremer, Krug, Kuglitsch, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Macco, Mason, Meyers, Mursau, Murtha, Nerison, Neylon, Novak, Nygren, Ohnstad, Petersen, Petryk, Quinn, R. Brooks, Riemer, Ripp, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sanfelippo, Sargent, Schraa, Skowronski, Spiros, Spreitzer, Steffen, Steineke, Stuck, Swearingen, T. Larson, Tittl, Tranel, VanderMeer, Vorpagel, Vos, Wachs and Weatherston of the Assembly added as cosponsors |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-02-05 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-02-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Bewley, C. Larson, Cowles, Gudex, Harsdorf, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, S. Fitzgerald, Shilling, Tiffany, Vinehout and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Roth added as a coauthor |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-3-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |