WI SJR66 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming November 2017 as diabetes awareness month.
Title
Proclaiming November 2017 as diabetes awareness month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-14 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr66 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SJR66.pdf |