WI SJR65 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating the 185th anniversary of the convening of Wisconsin's first territorial legislature.
Title
Commemorating the 185th anniversary of the convening of Wisconsin's first territorial legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-27 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-27 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-27 | House | Concurred in |
2021-10-27 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-10-25 | House | Read and referred to calendar of 10-27-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |