WI SJR63 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of James Jeskewitz.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of James Jeskewitz.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 21 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-8-2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-18 | House | Concurred in |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senator Grothman added as a coauthor |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-22-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |