WI SJR55 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing June 19, 2017, as Juneteenth Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing June 19, 2017, as Juneteenth Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative Tittl added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-14 | House | Concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-06-14 | House | Read |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Representatives Ballweg, Steffen, Duchow, Bernier and Katsma added as cosponsors |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |