WI SJR54 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and military service of United States Army Corporal Justin David Ross.
Title
The life and military service of United States Army Corporal Justin David Ross.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 24 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-9-2012 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2012 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-26 | House | Concurred in |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Entire membership of the Senate added as coauthors |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Read |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-17-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |