WI SJR53 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and military service of United States Army Pfc. Jacob A. Gassen (Jake).
Title
The life and military service of United States Army Pfc. Jacob A. Gassen (Jake).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-9-2012 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2012 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-26 | House | Concurred in |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-18 | House | LRB correction |
2012-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Entire membership of the Senate added as coauthors |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Read |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-17-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |