WI SJR45 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 2016 as USO Wisconsin Month.
Title
Proclaiming February 2016 as USO Wisconsin Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | House | Concurred in |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Introduced |