WI SJR42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Representative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: the commitment-to-family policy of Karen Bogenschneider of Verona, Wisconsin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The commitment-to-family policy of Karen Bogenschneider of Verona, Wisconsin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19SenateRepresentative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor
2017-05-23SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-05-11SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-05-10HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-10HouseConcurred in
2017-05-10HouseRules suspended and taken up
2017-05-10HouseRead
2017-05-10HouseReceived from Senate
2017-05-10SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-10SenateCarpenter, Craig, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Hansen, Kapenga, Larson, Lasee, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Nass, Petrowski, Ringhand, Roth, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors
2017-05-10SenateAdopted
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-04-26SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2017-04-26SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-04-26SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2017-04-26SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback