WI SJR42 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Representative Robert K. Zukowski.
Title
The life and public service of Representative Robert K. Zukowski.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 11 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-26-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Bewley, C. Larson, Carpenter, Cowles, Darling, Erpenbach, Gudex, Hansen, Harris Dodd, Harsdorf, Kapenga, L. Taylor, Lasee, Lassa, LeMahieu, Marklein, Miller, Nass, Olsen, Petrowski, Ringhand, Risser, Roth, S. Fitzgerald, Shilling, Stroebel, Tiffany, Vinehout, Vukmir, Wanggaard and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Introduced |