WI SJR41 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating the University of Wisconsin-Madison Men's Basketball team on its 2016-2017 season and advancing to the NCAA Sweet 16.
Title
Congratulating the University of Wisconsin-Madison Men's Basketball team on its 2016-2017 season and advancing to the NCAA Sweet 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Concurred in |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-05-02 | House | Read |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Bewley, C. Larson, Carpenter, Cowles, Craig, Erpenbach, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Harsdorf, Johnson, Kapenga, L. Taylor, Lasee, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Nass, Petrowski, Roth, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 5-2-2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Representatives Genrich and Tusler added as cosponsors |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senator Olsen added as a coauthor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced |