WI SJR41 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing the nineteenth day of June, 2015, as Juneteenth Day.
Title
Recognizing the nineteenth day of June, 2015, as Juneteenth Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Representatives Ballweg, Barca, Bernier, Billings, Born, Brandtjen, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Craig, Czaja, Doyle, Edming, Gannon, Heaton, Horlacher, Hutton, Jacque, Jagler, Jarchow, Jorgensen, Kahl, Kapenga, Katsma, Kerkman, Kitchens, Kleefisch, Knodl, Knudson, Kooyenga, Kremer, Krug, Kuglitsch, Kulp, T. Larson, Loudenbeck, Macco, Meyers, Murphy, Mursau, Murtha, Nerison, Neylon, Novak, Nygren, A. Ott, J. Ott, Petersen, Petryk, Quinn, Riemer, Ripp, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sanfelippo, Schraa, Shankland, Skowronski, Spiros, Steineke, Stuck, Swearingen, Tauchen, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel, VanderMeer, Vorpagel and Weatherston added as cosponsors |
2015-06-09 | House | Concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-06-09 | House | Read |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senator Shilling added as a coauthor |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Introduced |