WI SJR39 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing June 19, 2013, as Juneteenth Day.
Title
Recognizing June 19, 2013, as Juneteenth Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-06-12 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-06-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-11-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Representative Berceau added as a cosponsor |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Senator T. Cullen added as a coauthor |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr39 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SJR39.pdf |