WI SJR31 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-14)
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and contributions of former Secretary of Administration and Chairman of the BMO Harris Bradley Center, Marc Marotta.
Title
Honoring the life and contributions of former Secretary of Administration and Chairman of the BMO Harris Bradley Center, Marc Marotta.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 10 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-26-2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Young added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-12 | House | Concurred in |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Carpenter, Darling, Gudex, Harsdorf, Kapenga, Lasee, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Petrowski, Roth, Stroebel, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |