WI SJR23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring April 22, 2021, as the 51st Anniversary of Earth Day.
Title
Honoring April 22, 2021, as the 51st Anniversary of Earth Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Representatives Spreitzer, Emerson and Andraca added as cosponsors |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Representatives S. Rodriguez and Vining added as cosponsors |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |