WI SJR2 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Published 5-11-2023. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Published 5-11-2023. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 8 (2) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: conditions for release prior to conviction, including the imposition of bail (second consideration).
Title
Conditions for release prior to conviction, including the imposition of bail (second consideration).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Published 5-11-2023. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 1-19-2023 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-01-19 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 74, Noes 23 |
2023-01-19 | House | Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary, Ayes 35, Noes 62 |
2023-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-01-19 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-01-19 | House | Read a second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give joint resolution its third reading |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Representatives Brooks and Donovan added as cosponsors |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |