WI SJR2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To renumber and amend section 9m of article I; and to create section 9m (1) of article I, section 9m (4) of article I, section 9m (5) of article I and section 9m (6) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: the rights of crime victims (second consideration).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The rights of crime victims (second consideration).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateNot published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 3
2019-05-23SenateDeposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-23-2019
2019-05-21SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-05-16SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-05-15HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 82, Noes 15
2019-05-15HouseRules suspended
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15HouseRead a second time
2019-05-15HouseRules suspended and taken up
2019-05-15HouseRead
2019-05-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-15SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15SenateRead a third time and adopted, Ayes 27, Noes 5
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended
2019-05-15SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-05-15SenateRead a second time
2019-05-13SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-02-01SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2019-01-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-01-16SenateReport adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-01-15SenateExecutive action taken
2019-01-09SenatePublic hearing held
2019-01-08SenateRepresentatives Dittrich and Brandtjen added as cosponsors
2019-01-08SenateSenators Darling and Cowles added as coauthors
2019-01-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback