WI SJR17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: the life and public service of Richard A. Grobschmidt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The life and public service of Richard A. Grobschmidt.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateNot published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
2017-05-15SenateDeposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-15-2017
2017-05-08SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-05-03SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-05-02HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-02HouseConcurred in
2017-05-02HouseRules suspended and taken up
2017-05-02HouseRead
2017-05-02HouseReceived from Senate
2017-05-02SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-02SenateAdopted by unanimous rising vote
2017-05-02SenateRead
2017-05-02SenateBewley, Carpenter, Craig, Erpenbach, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Harsdorf, Johnson, Kapenga, Lasee, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, Roth, Shilling, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Vukmir, Wanggaard and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors
2017-05-02SenateSenator Cowles added as a coauthor
2017-04-28SenatePlaced on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-03-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-03-09SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2017-03-09SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback