WI SJR13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating Bruce Larson on being named the 2015 Don Shula NFL National High School Coach of the Year.
Title
Congratulating Bruce Larson on being named the 2015 Don Shula NFL National High School Coach of the Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-03-27 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr13 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SJR13.pdf |