WI SJR114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: the life and service to higher education of Chancellor Emeritus Charles W. Sorensen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The life and service to higher education of Chancellor Emeritus Charles W. Sorensen.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-22HouseRead and referred to committee on Rules
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateAdopted
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-08SenateRepresentative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor
2018-03-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-07SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2018-03-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback