WI SJR11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing Black History Month.
Title
Recognizing Black History Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-02-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-28 | House | Concurred in |
2013-02-26 | House | Placed on calendar 2-28-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-02-22 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced |