WI SB981 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 106.05 (1) (a) and 106.05 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 38.04 (26), 106.273 (2) (b) and 118.34 (1); to amend 106.05 (title), 106.05 (2) (a) (intro.), 106.05 (2) (b) (intro.), 106.05 (2) (c), 106.05 (3) (a) and 106.05 (3) (b) (intro.); and to create 38.04 (26) (b), 38.40 (2g), 71.05 (6) (b) 57., 106.05 (1) (e) to (f), 106.05 (1) (v), 106.05 (2m), 106.273 (2) (b) 1. and 118.34 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: apprenticeship and youth apprenticeship completion awards, career and technical education incentive grants and completion awards, technical preparation programs in school districts and technical colleges, creating an individual income tax subtraction for expenses paid for apprenticeship programs, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Apprenticeship and youth apprenticeship completion awards, career and technical education incentive grants and completion awards, technical preparation programs in school districts and technical colleges, creating an individual income tax subtraction for expenses paid for apprenticeship programs, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic and Workforce Development |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced |