WI SB97 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 340.01 (22e); and to create 340.01 (22e) (a) 3. and 340.01 (22e) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for certain traffic violations where highway maintenance workers are present and providing a penalty.
Title
Penalties for certain traffic violations where highway maintenance workers are present and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-10 | House | LRB correction |
2023-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senator James added as a coauthor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |