WI SB96 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 947.065 of the statutes; Relating to: participation in a riot and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in a riot and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10SenateRepresentative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
2023-03-22SenateRepresentatives Gundrum and O'Connor added as cosponsors
2023-03-17SenateRepresentative Knodl added as a cosponsor
2023-03-01SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-03-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback