WI SB96 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 74.37 (2), 74.37 (3) (a), 74.37 (3) (b) and 74.37 (3) (c); to renumber and amend 74.37 (3) (d); and to amend 70.47 (2), 70.47 (8m), 74.37 (title), 74.37 (1), 74.37 (4) and 74.37 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: actions for excessive property tax assessments.
Title
Actions for excessive property tax assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 25, Noes 8 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Schachtner, Smith, Johnson, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Hansen and Larson |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |