WI SB958 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (55v), 118.07 (6) and 121.02 (1) (L) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: required human trafficking prevention instruction in certain grades and teacher training related to identifying victims of child trafficking. (FE)
Title
Required human trafficking prevention instruction in certain grades and teacher training related to identifying victims of child trafficking. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Representative Dittrich withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |