WI SB95 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.225 (1) to (4) and 119.18 (6) (a); to renumber 120.13 (1) (f), 120.13 (1) (h) 1. a. and 121.58 (6); to renumber and amend 118.225 (intro.); to consolidate, renumber and amend 119.18 (6) (intro.) and (b); to amend 43.70 (3), 115.88 (1), 115.88 (1m) (a), 118.125 (5) (b), 118.30 (2) (c), 118.43 (3) (intro.), 118.43 (6) (b) 10., 120.12 (3) (a), (b) and (c), 120.13 (1) (h) 4., 120.17 (8) (a) and 121.58 (6) (title); and to create 118.33 (1) (e), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2m., 118.43 (3r), 120.13 (1) (f) 2. and 3., 120.13 (1) (h) 1. ag., 120.13 (1) (h) 1. c., 120.13 (1) (h) 2m., 120.13 (1) (h) 3m., 120.13 (1) (h) 4m., 120.13 (1) (h) 5m., 120.13 (1) (h) 6m. and 121.58 (6) (b) of the statutes; relating to: granting high school credit for extracurricular sports; services provided by a special education program; transportation aid paid to school districts; the use of moneys received by a school district from the common school fund; using the results of standardized examinations to evaluate, discharge, suspend, or discipline a teacher or for the nonrenewal of a teacher's contract; the number of teaching days scheduled in the Milwaukee Public Schools; permitting a school district to limit the grades in which to reduce class size under the Student Achievement Guarantee in Education Program; permitting a school board to deny enrollment to a pupil who has been expelled from an out-of-state school or from an independent charter school in this state and permitting an independent charter school to expel a pupil; use of law enforcement records to take disciplinary action against a pupil under a school district's athletic code; and changing the date by which a school district must certify the amount of its property tax levy. (FE)
Title
Granting high school credit for extracurricular sports; services provided by a special education program; transportation aid paid to school districts; the use of moneys received by a school district from the common school fund; using the results of standardized examinations to evaluate, discharge, suspend, or discipline a teacher or for the nonrenewal of a teacher's contract; the number of teaching days scheduled in the Milwaukee Public Schools; permitting a school district to limit the grades in which to reduce class size under the Student Achievement Guarantee in Education Program; permitting a school board to deny enrollment to a pupil who has been expelled from an out-of-state school or from an independent charter school in this state and permitting an independent charter school to expel a pupil; use of law enforcement records to take disciplinary action against a pupil under a school district's athletic code; and changing the date by which a school district must certify the amount of its property tax levy. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | Published 12-20-2011 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-7-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 105 |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2011 |
2011-11-07 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 11-7-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | House | Representative Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 54, Noes 38, Paired 6 |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 89, Noes 5 |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Krusick |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Hulsey, Grigsby, Roys, Berceau, Danou, Jorgensen, Turner, Pope-Roberts, Clark, Ringhand, Zamarripa and C. Taylor |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 37 |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:06 A.M. on 11-03-2011 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 18 |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Clark, Pope-Roberts, Sinicki and Hintz |
2011-11-01 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 11-1-2011 |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senators C. Larson, Vinehout, Taylor, Carpenter, Risser, Miller, Holperin, Lassa, T. Cullen, Hansen, Erpenbach and S. Coggs |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 laid on table |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senators Shilling and Taylor |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 10-20-2011 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Introduced |