WI SB945 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.05 (5g) and 756.04 (11) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: notifications to local elections officials and the elections commission regarding certain prospective jurors. (FE)
Title
Notifications to local elections officials and the elections commission regarding certain prospective jurors. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 58, Noes 35, Paired 2 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:15 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30 |
2022-02-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |