WI SB94 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 145.02 (2); to amend 101.63 (1) (intro.) and 101.82 (1); and to create 145.02 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: standards for the construction and inspection of camping units; for installing, repairing, and maintaining electrical wiring in camping units; and for plumbing in camping units; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Standards for the construction and inspection of camping units; for installing, repairing, and maintaining electrical wiring in camping units; and for plumbing in camping units; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 49 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Government Reform |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Introduced |