WI SB93 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 289.01 (33); and to create 30.20 (2m), 289.01 (31g) and 289.01 (33) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: sediment removed from Lake Michigan or Lake Superior.
Title
Sediment removed from Lake Michigan or Lake Superior.
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Calvin Callahan [R] |
Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Jacque and Cowles |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |