WI SB921 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.75 (1) (a) 1.; and to create 16.756 and 20.932 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibition on awarding state contracts or grants to entities that require customers or clients to provide proof of vaccination for COVID-19 for entry onto the premises of the entity or before providing services. (FE)
Title
Prohibition on awarding state contracts or grants to entities that require customers or clients to provide proof of vaccination for COVID-19 for entry onto the premises of the entity or before providing services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |