WI SB906 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (4) (hq) and 287.21 (intro.); and to create 287.25 of the statutes; Relating to: education about rechargeable batteries and providing grants for collecting and recycling rechargeable batteries. (FE)
Title
Education about rechargeable batteries and providing grants for collecting and recycling rechargeable batteries. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |