WI SB892 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0511 (2); and to create 66.0511 (2) (a), (b), (c), (d) and (e) and (4) and 165.85 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: law enforcement agency policies on the use of force. (FE)
Title
Law enforcement agency policies on the use of force. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb892 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB892.pdf |