WI SB883 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 238.15 (1) (f) 1.; and to consolidate, renumber and amend 238.15 (1) (f) (intro.) and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the certification criteria to be a qualified new business venture. (FE)
Title
Modifying the certification criteria to be a qualified new business venture. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |