WI SB883 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Published 12-15-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Published 12-15-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.395 (2) (fq); to renumber and amend 71.07 (7) (b) and 71.365 (1); to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 14., 71.07 (7) (c), 71.36 (1), 73.03 (71) and 77.51 (13g) (intro.); to create 71.05 (10) (dm), 71.07 (7) (b) 3., 71.21 (6), 71.365 (1) (b), 71.365 (4m), 71.775 (3) (a) 4., 73.03 (71) (d), 77.51 (13gm), 84.54 and 86.51 of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, section 9145 (4w); Relating to: state and local highway projects; expenditure of transportation moneys received from the federal government; determining a reduction in individual income tax rates; and election of pass-through entities to be taxed at the entity level. (FE)
Title
State and local highway projects; expenditure of transportation moneys received from the federal government; determining a reduction in individual income tax rates; and election of pass-through entities to be taxed at the entity level. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - House - Assembly: Ordered immediately messaged (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Assembly: Rules suspended (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Withdrawn from the committee on Senate Organization and taken up (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Assembly: Rules suspended (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Withdrawn from the committee on Senate Organization and taken up (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Senate | Published 12-15-2018 |
2018-12-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-14-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 368 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-13-2018 |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-12-04 | House | Ordered immediately messaged, Ayes 58, Noes 26 |
2018-12-04 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 57, Noes 27 |
2018-12-04 | House | Rules suspended, Ayes 58, Noes 26 |
2018-12-04 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Read a second time |
2018-12-04 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 12-4-2018 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2018-12-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and taken up, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |