WI SB866 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2021 Wisconsin Act 58, section 9104 (1) (g) 2g. and 2r.; Relating to: an addition to the 2021-23 Authorized State Building Program for the construction of additional columbarium units at the Southern Wisconsin Veterans Memorial Cemetery. (FE)
Title
An addition to the 2021-23 Authorized State Building Program for the construction of additional columbarium units at the Southern Wisconsin Veterans Memorial Cemetery. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |