WI SB856 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 969.02 (1), 969.02 (8) and 969.03 (1) (intro.); and to create 969.02 (2g) and 969.03 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: bail for criminal defendants who have a previous conviction for a felony or violent misdemeanor. (FE)
Title
Bail for criminal defendants who have a previous conviction for a felony or violent misdemeanor. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |