WI SB855 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.835 (1) (zm) and 73.03 (78) of the statutes; Relating to: local grant writing and compliance assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Local grant writing and compliance assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |