WI SB855 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: additional compensation and recruitment and retention benefits for correctional officers, youth counselors, and psychiatric care technicians.
Title
Additional compensation and recruitment and retention benefits for correctional officers, youth counselors, and psychiatric care technicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |