WI SB85 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 33.26 (2), 33.30 (2) (a), 33.32 (1) (c), 33.32 (1) (e) and 33.32 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing email for notice of public inland lake protection and rehabilitation district board business.
Title
Authorizing email for notice of public inland lake protection and rehabilitation district board business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Senate | Published 12-7-2023 |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 62 |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023 |
2023-11-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-11-16 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-10-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |