WI SB85 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (3n) (a) 1., 36.27 (3n) (a) 2., 36.27 (3p) (a) (intro.), 38.24 (7) (a) 1., 38.24 (7) (a) 2. and 38.24 (8) (a) (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: eligibility for tuition fee remission for certain veterans and their spouses, surviving spouses, and children.
Title
Eligibility for tuition fee remission for certain veterans and their spouses, surviving spouses, and children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Higher Education | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb85 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB85.pdf |