WI SB849 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.90, 62.50 (1j), 62.90, 77.70 (2) (c), 77.701 (2) (c), 77.701 (3), 79.039 (1) and 79.039 (1m); and to amend 62.50 (1h), 62.50 (1m), 62.50 (3) (title), 62.50 (3) (a), 62.50 (3) (am) and 66.1105 (2) (f) 2. e. of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating and modifying certain provisions enacted under 2023 Act 12 regarding the city of Milwaukee and Milwaukee County. (FE)
Title
Eliminating and modifying certain provisions enacted under 2023 Act 12 regarding the city of Milwaukee and Milwaukee County. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |