WI SB847 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 32.22 and 66.1201 (10) (b) to (g); and to amend 32.03 (6) (a) (intro.), 32.06 (intro.), 66.1201 (10) (a), 66.1311 (3), 66.1313 (1), 66.1331 (4) (b), 66.1333 (3) (f), 66.1333 (5) (b) 1., 66.1333 (5) (c) 1r. and 66.1337 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the eminent domain laws. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the eminent domain laws. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb847 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB847.pdf |