WI SB847 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0422 (2) (c), 66.0422 (4), 66.0422 (5), 196.504 (1) (c) and 196.504 (2) (e); to renumber 196.504 (1) (ab), 196.504 (1) (ad), 196.504 (1) (ae), 196.504 (1) (am) and 196.504 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 196.504 (1) (ac); to amend 71.28 (5n) (c), 196.504 (2) (a) and 196.504 (2) (c); and to create 20.155 (3) (a), 20.155 (3) (g), 71.07 (5n) (c) 6., 196.504 (1) (af), 196.504 (1) (d), 196.504 (1) (f), 196.504 (1) (i), 196.504 (2g), 196.504 (2r) and 196.504 (3) (d), (e) and (f) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the broadband expansion grant program; local government telecommunications, video, or broadband service facilities; claiming the manufacturing and agriculture tax credit; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the broadband expansion grant program; local government telecommunications, video, or broadband service facilities; claiming the manufacturing and agriculture tax credit; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb847 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB847.pdf |