WI SB84 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.49 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the award of Wisconsin Merit scholarships to University of Wisconsin System students. (FE)
Title
The award of Wisconsin Merit scholarships to University of Wisconsin System students. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |