WI SB84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 450.135 of the statutes; Relating to: access to investigational drugs, devices, and biological products and limitations on liability related to their use.
Title
Access to investigational drugs, devices, and biological products and limitations on liability related to their use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 165 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:03 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2017-08-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |