WI SB83 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 97.26 of the statutes; Relating to: labeling a food product as a type of milk and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Labeling a food product as a type of milk and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Representative Dallman added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |