WI SB83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 108.04 (2) (a) 3. (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption from work search requirements for certain individuals claiming unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Title
An exemption from work search requirements for certain individuals claiming unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb83 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB83.pdf |