WI SB828 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2019 Wisconsin Act 170, section 4 (1) (dm); Relating to: administration of the online early learning pilot program in the 2022-23 school year.
Title
Administration of the online early learning pilot program in the 2022-23 school year.
Sponsors
Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Robert Wittke [R] |
Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Published 4-1-2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-31-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 215 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |